THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:07:52 PM
Poliquin, Vanessa
CPSO#:
94782
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
11 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 Oct 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2011 to 09 Mar 2011
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2014 to 11 Dec 2014
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Dec 2014 |