THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 7:39:18 AM
Patel, Rikin K
CPSO#:
94781
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7013
Fax: 416-281-7102
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:18 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RIKIN K PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2011 to 06 Mar 2011
EL - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 28 May 2011
EL - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2015 |