THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:33:10 AM
Rouhani, Shiva
CPSO#:
94769
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
512 Oxford St E
London ON N5Y 3H7
Phone: (519) 601-6601
Fax: (519) 601-6603
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Aug 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jan 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 19 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
|
Active |