THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:59:05 AM
Edwards, Michelle Diane
CPSO#:
94767
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Center
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6084
Fax: 416-352-6013
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHELLE DIANE EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Jan 2011 to 20 Feb 2011
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2012 |