THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:19:37 AM
McCloskey, Paula Martina
CPSO#:
94766
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
02 Mar 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Jan 2011 to 29 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 30 Mar 2011 to 13 Feb 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2012 to 30 Mar 2012
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Mar 2012 |