THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:48:27 AM
Markose, George
CPSO#:
94765
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Charing Cross Hospital Medical School, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHS Henderson General Hospital
Department of Radiology
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
West Haldimand,General Hospital |
Hagersville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:25 Sep 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Interventional Radiology |
Effective:25 Sep 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jan 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Sep 2020 |
|
Active |