THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:59:55 AM
Chui, Sze Wing
CPSO#:
94747
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Chinese University of Hong Kong Faculty, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 34435
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Chui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 4 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:20 May 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SZE WING CHUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 15 Feb 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2022 |