THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:02:13 AM
Ogaick, Maurice James Karim
CPSO#:
94733
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2011 to 31 Jan 2011
EL - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 28 Feb 2011
EL - Surgical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2012 to 29 Feb 2012
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Mar 2012
EL - Surgical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2015 |