THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:35:08 PM
Khoshnam, Mohsen
CPSO#:
94727
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Hormozgan University of Medical Sciences, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
425 St Mary Ave
Winnipeg Clinic
Winnipeg MB R3C 0N2
Phone: 2049573243
Fax: 2049433516
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:23 Jun 2023 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHSEN KHOSHNAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOSHNAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2011 to 29 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 30 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2023 |