THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:50:03 AM
Foley, Karen Anne
CPSO#:
94715
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room EN3 437
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3567
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:28 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAREN ANNE FOLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 15 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 16 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 05 Sep 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2016 |