THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:31:11 AM
Kini, Vishwas Manjunath
CPSO#:
94686
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Konkani, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Karnatak University Dharwar, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 115
4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON L6P 2K7
Phone: (905) 794-9685
Fax: (905) 794-2826
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VISHWAS MANJUNATH KINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KINI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Dec 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Oct 2011 |