THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:05:10 AM
Lebel, David Eduard
CPSO#:
94678
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Aug 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
S107 - 555 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Surgery
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7981
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:07 Aug 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 07 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2018 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Aug 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2021 |
|
Active |