THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:22:29 PM
Aghel, Nazanin
CPSO#:
94670
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
A3-78 Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42443
Fax: (905)-575-7320
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Aug 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2011 to 23 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Mar 2012
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Mar 2016
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 22 Mar 2018
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Mar 2019
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Jul 2019
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2019 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2024 |
|
Active |