THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 16:35:17 PM
Johnson, Samuel Ceaser
CPSO#:
94664
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education
as of
08 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Rajah Muthiah Medical College, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Surgery
Queen's university
East York ON M4C 3E7
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMUEL CEASER JOHNSON shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JOHNSON is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;
(2) Dr. JOHNSON shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JOHNSON is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. JOHNSON shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JOHNSON is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JOHNSON no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
Note: This certificate expires on 31 May 2025.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 11 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jun 2021 to 31 Aug 2021
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2021 to 31 May 2022
CF - Neurosurgery
Queen's University, 01 Jun 2022 to 30 Jun 2022
CF - Neurosurgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
CF - Neurosurgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2023 to 31 May 2024
CF - Neurosurgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2024 to 31 May 2025
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2021 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 May 2025 |