THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:20:44 AM
Al-Karawi, Sarmad Azeez Ibrahim
CPSO#:
94663
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Al-Nahrain University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2011 to 25 Feb 2011
PEAP - CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 26 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |