THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:46:54 PM
Felemegos, Ioannis
CPSO#:
94647
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PRESCOTT FAMILY ASSOCIATES
555 KING STREET WEST
Prescott ON K0E 1T0
Phone: (613) 925-5977
Fax: (613) 925-1238
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Vermont
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IOANNIS FELEMEGOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELEMEGOS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Dec 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 06 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2011 |