THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:07:14 PM
Verrilli, David Vincent
CPSO#:
94641
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Village Family Health Team
Unit 102
171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON M6K 3P6
Phone: (416) 599-8348
Fax: (416) 599-2001
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID VINCENT VERRILLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERRILLI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 13 Dec 2010 to 23 Jan 2011
EL - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Jan 2011 to 04 Feb 2011
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2011 |