THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:50:32 AM
Naeem, Nauman
CPSO#:
94621
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Spanish, Urdu
Education: Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1723 Kipling Avenue, Suite 2G
Etobicoke ON M9R 4E1
Phone: (647) 748-8011
Fax: (647) 748-8012
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:13 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:23 Jun 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAUMAN NAEEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAEEM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2010 |