THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:52:14 AM
Passos, Edward Martins
CPSO#:
94609
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: Fundacao Universidade Do Amazonas (UFAM), 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 381.9365
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD MARTINS PASSOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASSOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2010 to 15 Feb 2011
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |