THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:36:47 PM
Rafat Zand, Khashayar
CPSO#:
94605
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, French
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - Massachusetts
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHASHAYAR RAFAT ZAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAFAT ZAND is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2020 |