THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:33:16 AM
Rasool, Kashif Ghulam
CPSO#:
94598
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Windsor-Essex Community Health Centre
Suite 101
1361 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON N8X 1J6
Date Received: 23 Mar 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Nov 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 04 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |