THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:18:53 PM
Antunes, Paulo Rui Mendonca
CPSO#:
94581
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
08 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese, Spanish
Education: National Autonomous Univ of Guadalajara, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
601 Chemin Limoges
Bureau 201
Limoges ON K0A 2M0
Phone: 613-557-2210
Fax: 613-557-2084
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
USA - Maine
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jan 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Nov 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2013 |
|
Active |