THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:10:13 AM
Wahalawatta, Punsara Dasuni
CPSO#:
94566
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1385 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1H 8N4
Phone: 613-233-6652
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Wahalawatta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 7 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 15 Mar 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
|
Active |