THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:04:45 AM
Kyle, David William
CPSO#:
94558
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College, Cork, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Paterson Medical Centre
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-3021
Fax: (807) 468-6964
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM KYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2012 |