THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:22:45 PM
Ranaweera, Kumudini
CPSO#:
94557
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhala
Education: University of Ruhuna, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON N2L 3G1
Phone: (519) 888-4567
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KUMUDINI RANAWEERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANAWEERA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 23 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2013 |