THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:41:27 AM
Moudgil, Bineet
CPSO#:
94556
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Medical University of the Americas (Nevi, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1935 Paris St
Sudbury ON P3E 3C6
Phone: 7055228300
Electoral District: 08
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BINEET MOUDGIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUDGIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Oct 2010 to 16 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Jan 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2014 |