THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:17:01 PM
Lacaze-Masmonteil, Thierry
CPSO#:
94545
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Apr 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Universite of Rene Descartes (Paris V), 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: T. Lacaze-Masmonteil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 19 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
France
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2024 |