THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:57:40 PM
Manhas, Inderdeep Singh
CPSO#:
94525
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: National University of Ireland, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2044
2048 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON M1R 1V2
Phone: (416) 331-9111
Fax: (416) 331-9050
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. INDERDEEP SINGH MANHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANHAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2012 to 19 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2013 |