THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:06:47 PM
Cyr, Priscille Marie Georgette
CPSO#:
94516
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hawkesbury and District
General Hospital
1111 rue Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3E5
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRISCILLE MARIE GEORGETTE CYR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CYR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 18 Oct 2010 to 13 Nov 2010
EL - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
EL - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 13 Oct 2014 to 23 Nov 2014
EL - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2016 |