THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:47:39 PM
Zizzo, Steven Vincent
CPSO#:
94515
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
325 Winterberry Drive
Hamilton ON L8J 0B6
Phone: (905) 575-9004
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN VINCENT ZIZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIZZO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 21 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 22 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |