THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:56:56 PM
Youssef, Hany Awny Ayad
CPSO#:
94510
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
13025 Yonge Street
PO Box 2639
Richmond Hill ON L4E 1A6
Phone: (905) 773-3342
Fax: (905) 773-9669
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital |
Uxbridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANY AWNY AYAD YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 2020 |