THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 16:51:27 PM
Bickhram, Mahendra
CPSO#:
94497
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
25-16945 Leslie St
Insight Care Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 9A2
Phone: 905-836-2223
Fax: 18668451781
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHENDRA BICKHRAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BICKHRAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 17 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2012 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2021 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2022 |