THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 1:39:21 AM
Das, Sunit
CPSO#:
94486
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northwestern University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Division of Neurosurgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5548
Fax: (416) 864-5596
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:01 Jul 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Oct 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 14 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2018 |
|
Active |