THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:00:39 AM
Gibbons Gomez, Paul
CPSO#:
94483
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Sep 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:10 Nov 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAUL GIBBONS GOMEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GIBBONS GOMEZ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 04 Feb 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: November 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: April 13, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 16, 2020, Dr. Gibbons Gomez has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)