THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:03:55 AM
Ruparelia, Raj
CPSO#:
94481
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Nottingham, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore Medical Group
Suite 502 - 345 Lakeshore Rd E
Oakville ON L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 845-4511
Fax: (905) 845-8133
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJ RUPARELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUPARELIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2010 to 09 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 17 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2012 |