THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:22:29 AM
Luka, Marian Refaat Shaker
CPSO#:
94477
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
105 Sutherland Dr
Kingston ON K7K 5V6
Phone: (613)766-0318
Fax: (613)766-0339
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jan 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIAN REFAAT SHAKER LUKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUKA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 19 Oct 2010 to 10 Jan 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 11 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 19 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2013 |