THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:37:31 AM
Mohamed, Sarab Hameed
CPSO#:
94465
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Hospital
Hamilton ON L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73624
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Sarab Mohamed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAB HAMEED MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2012 |