THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:24:09 AM
Sampaio, Tatiana Zorub Assis Loreto
CPSO#:
94448
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Sao Paulo, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Ave
CMPA
PCS
Second Floor
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Phone: 18002656522
Fax: 18777631300
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:07 Oct 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Pediatric Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:07 Oct 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2010 to 03 Jan 2011
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Oct 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Oct 2020 |
|
Active |