THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:21:40 PM
Das, Pavani Reddy
CPSO#:
94444
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Northwestern University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Gw 33
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6130
Fax: (416) 756-6449
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Oct 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:24 Sep 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jul 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Nov 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2020 |
|
Active |