THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:27:47 PM
Terrett, Luke Andrew
CPSO#:
94431
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
103 Hospital Dr
Royal University Hospital
Department of Adult Critical Care
Adult ICU
Saskatoon SK S7N 0W8
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUKE ANDREW TERRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERRETT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2022 |