THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:11:28 AM
Chadwick, Mairi Margaret
CPSO#:
94430
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2010 to 18 Oct 2010
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |