THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 19:58:43 PM
Balmain, Sean
CPSO#:
94423
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Suite 18-364
600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7613
Fax: (416) 586-4775
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:20 Jun 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2010 to 17 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2019 |
|
Active |