THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:55:14 AM
Rahimi, Abdulwali Samad
CPSO#:
94422
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dari, English, Farsi, Hindi, Pashto, Urdu
Education: Marathwada University, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand Family Health Organization
Haldimand FHT Clinic
75 Parkview Road Suite 4
Hagersville ON N0A 1H0
Phone: (289) 524-0053
Fax: (289) 283-3029
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Texas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Norfolk General Hospital |
Simcoe |
West Haldimand,General Hospital |
Hagersville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:25 Jan 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Sep 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
|
Active |