THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:06:58 AM
Cabrera Abreu, Casimiro Jose
CPSO#:
94420
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad De La Laguna, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
Mood Disorders Service
752 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 4X3
Phone: 613 544 4900
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Providence Care Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 Nov 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2028 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2023 |
|
Active |