THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:07:04 PM
Qureshi, Omar
CPSO#:
94409
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Phone: (905) 721-3490
Fax: (905) 721-6699
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 06 Jul 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2012 |
|
Active |