THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:01:25 PM
Al-Tukmachi, Ahmad Mohammed Shihab
CPSO#:
94408
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Kufa University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-849 UPPER WENTWORTH ST
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
Phone: 905-3899099
Fax: (519) 371-5995
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AHMAD MOHAMMED SHIHAB AL-TUKMACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-TUKMACHI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Jul 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2014 |