THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:56:29 AM
Vasudev, Akshya
CPSO#:
94388
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
31 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Delhi, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
280-1295 Riverbend Rd
London ON N6K 0G2
Phone: 2264950440
Fax: 5199135414
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:16 May 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Nov 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2019 |
|
Active |