THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:33:14 AM
Primiani, Nadia Sarah
CPSO#:
94379
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 May 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian, Spanish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
206 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: (647) 480 0868
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:18 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADIA SARAH PRIMIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRIMIANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 24 Sep 2010
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2014 |