THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 12:32:51 PM
Rizkalla, Michel
CPSO#:
94376
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Nov 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Nov 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: All Saints University of Medicine, Aruba, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: January 26, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On January 26, 2023, Lake of the Woods District Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33(b) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5 (1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Michel Rizkalla’s hospital privileges were being suspended on an immediate basis.
On February 3, 2023, Lake of the Woods District Hospital notified the College that Dr. Rizkalla had withdrawn his application for Locum Tenens Professional Staff Privileges, effective January 31, 2023.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Aug 2010 to 21 Nov 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 22 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - General Surgery
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2016 to 25 Sep 2016
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2020 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 21 Sep 2023 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 27 Nov 2023 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 27 Nov 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 27 Nov 2023 |
|
Active |