THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 5:06:45 AM
Moller, Thomas Friedrich Adolf
CPSO#:
94374
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Feb 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Christian Alberts University at Kiel, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany
Norway
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 10 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
CF - Pediatric Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2016 |